Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Legault, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Kevin G. DeNoce presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 29, 2020 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 02, 2020 |
LeGault aka Dana Warren Ireland
Judge: Kevin G. DeNoce |
||
July 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
OSC - Change of Name - LeGault aka Dana Warren Ireland scheduled for 09/02/2020 at 08:20:00 AM in 43 at Ventura.
Judge: Kevin G. DeNoce |
|
June 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 43.
Judge: Kevin G. DeNoce |
|
June 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause re Change of Name filed by LeGault on 06/29/2020. | |
June 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Petition for Change of Name filed by LeGault on 06/29/2020. Filed By: LeGault,(Petitioner) | |
June 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by LeGault on 06/29/2020. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.