Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Arevalos, Maria Ceja, Esparanza, Jairo, Esparanza, Raul, Solano, Amanda, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Khakshouy, Judith Y, against Masredjian, Aram, Masredjian, Avetik, represented by Dewey, Brian S, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Kevin G. DeNoce presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2020 |
CategoryPi/Pd/Wd - Auto |
Last RefreshedAugust 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2023 | (3-5 day) Trial call | ||
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Posting Jury Fees filed by Arevalos, Maria Ceja; Esperanza, Jairo; Solano, Amanda; Esperanza, Raul on 07/18/2022. | |
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Pretrial Conference (CCM) - scheduled for 07/24/2023 at 01:30:00 PM in 21 at Ventura. | |
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Trial Setting Conference heard 07/15/2022 08:30:00 AM. | |
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (LC) - (3-5 day) Trial call scheduled for 08/07/2023 at 01:30:00 PM in 21 at Ventura. | |
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference - scheduled for 11/22/2022 at 10:00:00 AM in 22 at Ventura. | |
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Posting Jury Fees filed by Masredjian, Aram; Masredjian, Avetik on 07/15/2022. | |
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Trial Setting Conference heard 06/01/2022 08:30:00 AM. | |
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address and/or Telephone filed by Masredjian, Aram on 06/01/2022. | |
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling filed by Masredjian, Aram on 06/01/2022. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.