Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Mekaniks Plus, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Morrow, Michael A, against Gomez, Lorenzo, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Anthony J. Sabo presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 18, 2021 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions70 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time102 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2021 | |||
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment Or Order filed by Mekaniks Plus on 09/21/2020. | |
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Abstract issued on 09/21/2020. | |
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 01/18/2021 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated.
Judge: Anthony J. Sabo |
|
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Clerk's Judgment filed by Mekaniks Plus on 09/03/2020. | |
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (of Attorney Michael A Morrow in Support of Request for Prejudgment Interest, Costs & Attorney Fees in the Defaukt Judgment) filed by Mekaniks Plus on 09/03/2020. | |
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk. | |
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Judgment for Mekaniks Plus against Gomez, Lorenzo in the amount of: 7435.97 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 297.89 costs, 369.46 pre-judgment interest, and 960.00 attorney fees entered on 09/03/2020. | |
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by Mekaniks Plus on 09/03/2020. | |
August 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default filed by Mekaniks Plus on 08/20/2020. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.