Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Columbus, Mary Jo, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Alexander, Daniel H, against Roes 1 Through 50, Kahn, Matthew Joseph, represented by Cotter, John P., in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Anthony J. Sabo presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 17, 2020 |
CategoryPi/Pd/Wd - Auto |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2021 | |||
November 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement filed by Columbus, Mary Jo on 11/17/2020. | |
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Posting Jury Fees filed by Kahn, Matthew Joseph on 11/06/2020. | |
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event | ROES 1 through 50 added as a Cross - Defendant effective 11/06/2020. | |
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Cross-Complaint filed by Kahn, Matthew Joseph on 11/06/2020. Filed By: Kahn, Matthew Joseph(Cross - Complainant) Refers To: ROES 1 through 50(Cross - Defendant) | |
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer filed by Kahn, Matthew Joseph on 11/06/2020. | |
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons issued on 11/06/2020. | |
June 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 01/08/2021 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.
Judge: Anthony J. Sabo |
|
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 42.
Judge: Henry J. Walsh |
|
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by Columbus, Mary Jo on 06/10/2020. Filed By: Columbus, Mary Jo(Plaintiff) Refers To: Kahn, Matthew(Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.