Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Rivero, Monica, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Coons, Michael H, against El Super Grocery Store, Bodega Latina Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Anthony J. Sabo presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2021 |
CategoryPi/Pd/Wd - Other |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions84 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time84 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2021 | |||
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 01/06/2021 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated.
Judge: Anthony J. Sabo |
|
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Rivero, Monica on 09/02/2020. | |
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Kareny Ramirez Manager) filed by Rivero, Monica on 08/24/2020. | |
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 01/06/2021 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.
Judge: Anthony J. Sabo |
|
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 43.
Judge: Kevin G. DeNoce |
|
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by Rivero, Monica on 06/10/2020. Filed By: Rivero, Monica(Plaintiff) Refers To: Bodega Latina Corporation(Defendant) | El Super Grocery Store(Defendant) | |
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rivero, Monica on 06/10/2020. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.