Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lenehan, William filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 21, 2020 |
CategoryConservatorship Of Person And Estate |
Last RefreshedAugust 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2023 | Due 08/23/23 | ||
October 18, 2022 | For Approval of First Account and Report etc. | ||
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Supplement - Other (Verified Supplement to the First Account and Report etc.) filed by Ventura County Public Guardian on 07/20/2022. | |
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous (Death Certificate of Sandra Lee Wilson) filed by Ventura County Public Guardian on 07/20/2022. | |
July 05, 2022 | For Approval of First Account and Report etc. | ||
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Continued on Court's own motion. | |
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report - Due 08/23/23 scheduled for 10/03/2023 at 10:30:00 AM in J6 was vacated. | |
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Account and Report (PRC) - For Approval of First Account and Report etc. scheduled for 10/18/2022 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard. | |
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report scheduled on 10/03/23 is vacated. | |
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling published. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.