Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lara Forsberg, Renee, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Friedman, Todd M, against The Hettena Law Firm Lc, represented by Hettena, Alexander V, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Vincent J. O'Neill, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2019 |
CategoryWrongful Termination |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2020 | |||
March 16, 2020 |
potions of plaintiffs complaint
Judge: Vincent J. O'Neill, Jr. |
||
March 16, 2020 |
to plaintiffs complaint
Judge: Vincent J. O'Neill, Jr. |
||
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Demurrer (CLM) - to plaintiffs complaint scheduled for 03/16/2020 at 08:20:00 AM in 41 was vacated.
Judge: Vincent J. O'Neill, Jr. |
|
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike - potions of plaintiffs complaint scheduled for 03/16/2020 at 08:20:00 AM in 41 was vacated.
Judge: Vincent J. O'Neill, Jr. |
|
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint - Amended (FIRST) filed by Lara Forsberg, Renee on 03/03/2020. Filed By: Lara Forsberg, Renee(Plaintiff) Refers To: The Hettena Law Firm LC(Defendant) | |
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike - potions of plaintiffs complaint scheduled for 03/16/2020 at 08:20:00 AM in 41 at Ventura.
Judge: Vincent J. O'Neill, Jr. |
|
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Demurrer (CLM) - to plaintiffs complaint scheduled for 03/16/2020 at 08:20:00 AM in 41 at Ventura.
Judge: Vincent J. O'Neill, Jr. |
|
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Demurrer (to Pltfs Complaint for Damages; Memo of Points & Authorities) filed by The Hettena Law Firm LC on 02/10/2020. | |
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion to Strike (Portions of Pltfs Unverified Complaint; Memo of Points & Authorities in Support thereof) filed by The Hettena Law Firm LC on 02/10/2020. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.