Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Sebourn, Thomas J, against Laronda, Eric K, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Kevin G. DeNoce presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin G. DeNoce Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2019 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions171 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time171 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Discover Bank on 06/08/2020. | |
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration Regarding Non Service filed by Discover Bank on 02/11/2020. | |
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration Regarding Non Service filed by Discover Bank on 01/30/2020. | |
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 43.
Judge: Kevin G. DeNoce |
|
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration/Affidavit of Venue CCP 395/396 filed by Discover Bank on 12/20/2019. | |
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Discover Bank on 12/20/2019. | |
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by Discover Bank on 12/20/2019. Filed By: Discover Bank(Plaintiff) Refers To: Laronda, Eric(Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.