Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Renaissance Petroleum Llc, filed a(n) Writ Of Mandate case against County Of Ventura, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Mark S. Borrell presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2019 |
CategoryWrit Of Mandate |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2021 |
[CEQA]
Judge: Mark S. Borrell |
||
February 22, 2021 |
Re: Why the CEQA claim should not be dismissed from this case, pursuant to Pub. Res. Code section 21...
Judge: Mark S. Borrell |
||
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court's Order to Show Cause (CLM) - Re: Why the CEQA claim should not be dismissed from this case, pursuant to Pub. Res. Code section 21167.4(a), due to Petitioner's failure to timely file a request for hearing scheduled for 02/22/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in 40 was vacated.
Judge: Mark S. Borrell |
|
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference - [CEQA] scheduled for 03/01/2021 at 01:30:00 PM in 40 was vacated.
Judge: Mark S. Borrell |
|
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Renaissance Petroleum LLC on 02/04/2021. | |
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Response (to Order to Show Cause) filed by County of Ventura on 01/27/2021. | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Response (Petitioner's Preliminary Response to Order to Show Cause) filed by Renaissance Petroleum LLC on 01/15/2021. | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court's Order to Show Cause (CLM) - Re: Why the CEQA claim should not be dismissed from this case, pursuant to Pub. Res. Code section 21167.4(a), due to Petitioner's failure to timely file a request for hearing scheduled for 02/22/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in 40 at Ventura.
Judge: Mark S. Borrell |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.