Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Diana Gonzalez As A Minor By And Through Her Guardian Ad Litem Ana Gonzalez, Esmeralda Rodriguez As A Minor By And Through Her Guardian Ad Litem Violeta Rodriguez, Rodriguez, Violeta, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ercolani, Russ W, against City Of Moorpark, County Of Ventura, Ventura County Sheriff, Ventura County Sheriffs Office, represented by Burge, Darren G, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Benjamin F. Coats presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBenjamin F. Coats Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2019 |
CategoryPi/Pd/Wd - Auto |
Last RefreshedAugust 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2021 |
Judge: Benjamin F. Coats |
||
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by COUNTY OF VENTURA on 10/12/2021. | |
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Diana Gonzalez as a minor by and through her Guardian Ad Litem Ana Gonzalez on 10/08/2021. | |
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action submitted by Diana Gonzalez as a minor by and through her Guardian Ad Litem Ana Gonzalez rejected on 10/08/2021. | |
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Trial Setting Conference - scheduled for 10/20/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in 43 was vacated.
Judge: Benjamin F. Coats |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for heard 09/15/2021 01:57:00 PM. | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Trial Setting Conference - scheduled for 10/20/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in 43 at Ventura.
Judge: Benjamin F. Coats |
|
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party (as to Violeta Rodriguez Only) filed by Diana Gonzalez as a minor by and through her Guardian Ad Litem Ana Gonzalez; Esmeralda Rodriguez as a minor by and through her Guardian Ad Litem Violeta Rodriguez on 08/12/2021. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.