Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Haley, Barbara J filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2019 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 16, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
A final account is waived. Approve voluntarily reduced statutory fees of $2,350 to Petitioner's counsel. Petitioner waives her fees. Approve $1,209.50 in costs reimbursement to counsel. The proposed f...
Judge: Roger Lund |
|
June 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Proposed Action (Objection-Consent) (Consent by Eleanor Hatten-Wade) filed by Hatten-Wade, Eleanor on 06/25/2020. | |
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Proposed Action (Objection-Consent) filed by Hatten-Wade, Eleanor on 06/22/2020. | |
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Inventory and Appraisal (Final with attachment 2) filed by Hatten-Wade, Eleanor on 03/02/2020. | |
February 06, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
Grant. Appoint Petitioner Eleanor Hatten-Wade as the administrator of the estate, with full IAEA powers. Sole heir waives bond.
Judge: Roger Lund |
|
February 06, 2020 | |||
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Heir(s) waives bond. | |
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A. heard 02/06/2020 09:00:00 AM. | |
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Letter issued on 02/06/2020. | |
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Letters (of Administration Issued to Eleanor Hatten-Wade) filed by Hatten-Wade, Eleanor on 02/06/2020. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.