Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Andrade, Rudy filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 04, 2019 |
CategoryLimited Conservatorship Of Person Only |
Last RefreshedAugust 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2023 | Due 01/17/23 | ||
February 16, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Limited Conservator's biennial status report was due 1/19/21. As of 2/09/21 it has not been filed. Unless the report is filed before the hearing, the Court will set an OSC re Failure to File Annual St...
Judge: Roger Lund |
|
February 16, 2021 | Due 01/19/21 | ||
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report - Due 01/17/23 scheduled for 02/14/2023 at 10:30:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard. | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous (Order Re Biennial Review Schedule) filed by The Superior Court of Ventura on 02/16/2021. | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report Due 01/17/23 is scheduled for 02/14/2023 at 10:30AM in Department J6. | |
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice - Other (fo Filing Conservatorship Status Report) filed by Andrade-Alvarez, Maria Elena; Valencia, Jose Andrade on 02/11/2021. | |
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Confidential Status Report filed by Andrade-Alvarez, Maria Elena; Valencia, Jose Andrade on 02/11/2021. | |
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling published. | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Confidential Investigator report finalized. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.