Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Fraley, Laura filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 24, 2019 |
CategoryLetters Of Administration |
Last RefreshedAugust 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2022 | Reference only to case 2021-556110 | ||
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous Hearing (PRG) - Reference only to case 2021-556110 scheduled for 11/08/2022 at 10:30:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard. | |
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money into Blocked Account filed by Fraley, Laura on 02/02/2022. | |
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | JP Morgan Chase Bank added as a Interested Party effective 02/02/2022. | |
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Opening or Changing a Guardianship or Conservatorship Account or Safe Deposit Box filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank on 02/02/2022. | |
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous (Withdrawal of Claim for Personal Income Tax in the amount of $3197.43) filed by State of California Franchise Tax Board on 11/22/2021. | |
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous (Withdrawal of Request for Special Notice) filed by State of California Franchise Tax Board on 11/22/2021. | |
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Order to Deposit Money into Blocked Account filed by Fraley, Laura on 11/15/2021. | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | State of California Franchise Tax Board added as a Claimant effective 11/09/2021. | |
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Special Notice filed by State of California Franchise Tax Board on 11/08/2021. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.