Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Bop Camarillo Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Evans, Chris J, against Al Attiyan, Faisal, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 31, 2019 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions43 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time315 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Mail Returned Undeliverable (Notice that you have been sued - Return to sender, Not deliverable as addressed, Unable to forward.) received from The Superior Court of Ventura on 06/10/2020 | |
September 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment for Bop Camarillo LLC against Al Attiyan, Faisal in the amount of: 3355.29 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 330.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 431.78 attorney fees entered on 09/27/2019. | |
September 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Order - Other filed by Bop Camarillo LLC on 09/27/2019. | |
September 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Court filed by Bop Camarillo LLC on 09/27/2019. | |
September 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed by Bop Camarillo LLC on 09/20/2019. | |
September 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by Bop Camarillo LLC on 09/20/2019. | |
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Returned (Fully Satisfied) filed by Bop Camarillo LLC on 09/16/2019. | |
September 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default (Clerks Judgment) filed by Bop Camarillo LLC on 09/12/2019. | |
September 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Al Attiyan, Faisal on Complaint. | |
September 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ issued on 09/12/2019. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.