Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Williamson, Trisha G, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 30, 2019 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Case Cycle Time37 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling filed by Williamson, Trisha G on 09/05/2019. | |
September 04, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
Petitioner is directed to provide the deed for the 50% interest in 381 Baker Ave., Ventura, purchased from Petitioner's uncle. (Local Rule 10.14(A)(7).) Subject to a review of the deed, the Court inte...
Judge: Roger Lund |
|
September 04, 2019 | |||
September 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Spousal Property Petition heard 09/04/2019 09:00:00 AM. | |
September 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Spousal Property Petition has been Granted. | |
September 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Spousal Property Order filed by Williamson, Trisha G on 09/04/2019. | |
August 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling published. | |
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing (09.04.19) filed by Williamson, Trisha G on 08/02/2019. | |
July 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Spousal Property Petition - scheduled for 09/04/2019 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard. | |
July 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Spousal Property Petition filed by Williamson, Trisha G on 07/30/2019. Filed By: Williamson, Trisha G(Petitioner) Refers To: Williamson, John(Decedent) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.