Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Fidelity And Deposit Company Of Maryland, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case represented by Peacock, Albert E Iii, against Sierra Pacific Farms Inc, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Mark S. Borrell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark S. Borrell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 28, 2019 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 16, 2021 |
pltf to provide further responses to request for production of docs set one
Judge: Mark S. Borrell |
||
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland on 06/08/2021. | |
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel - pltf to provide further responses to request for production of docs set one scheduled for 06/16/2021 at 08:20:00 AM in 40 was vacated.
Judge: Mark S. Borrell |
|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Conditional Settlement (June 28, 2021) filed by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland on 05/17/2021. | |
May 12, 2021 |
pltf to provide further responses to request for production of docs set one
Judge: Mark S. Borrell |
||
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice - Other (of Continued Hearing to Defendants Sierra Pacific Farms Inc, Motion to Compel Plaintiffs Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, further Responses to Request for Production of Documents Set One) filed by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland on 05/11/2021. | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order (to Continue Def's Sierra Pacific Farms, Inc., Motion to Compel Pltf's Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, Further Responses to Request for Production of Documents, Set One, and Request for Monetary Sanctions) filed by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland on 05/07/2021. | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel - pltf to provide further responses to request for production of docs set one scheduled for 06/16/2021 at 08:20:00 AM in 40 at Ventura.
Judge: Mark S. Borrell |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.