Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Bolstad, Marsha Maude filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 27, 2019 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2020 | Due 08/24/20 | ||
September 08, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
On 7/28/20 the Court appointed Ventura County Public Guardian as Temporary conservator. Letters to issue. On 7/31/20 the Order Appointing PG as Temporary Conservator was filed. As of 9/20/20 no Letter...
Judge: Roger Lund |
|
July 28, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
The Inventory and Appraisal ("I&A") was due 11/26/19. On 3/03/20 the Court set an OSC re Failure to File I&A and Notice of Conservatee's Death. On 7/07/20, the Court will set an OSC re Removal of Cons...
Judge: Roger Lund |
|
July 07, 2020 | RE: Removal of Conservator for Failure to File Inventory & Appraisal Report | ||
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling published. | |
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Court's Order to Show Cause (PRC) - RE: Removal of Conservator for Failure to File Inventory & Appraisal Report scheduled for 07/07/2020 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard. | |
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Continuance VENTURA generated. | |
April 07, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
The inventory and appraisal ("I&A") was due by November 26, 2019. As of June 30, 2020, it has not been filed. Unless the I&A is filed before the hearing, the Court will set an OSC re Removal of Conser...
Judge: Roger Lund |
|
April 07, 2020 | RE: Removal of Conservator for Failure to File Inventory & Appraisal Report | ||
March 03, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
The inventory and appraisal ("I&A") was due by November 26, 2019. As of February 26, 2020, it has not been filed. Unless the I&A is filed before the hearing, the Court will set an OSC re Removal of Co...
Judge: Roger Lund |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.