Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Orness, Patricia, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Jeffrey, Iman, against Loredo, John Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Ronda J. McKaig presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRonda J. McKaig Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 10, 2019 |
CategoryPi/Pd/Wd - Auto |
Last RefreshedAugust 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2022 | |||
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Appearance RA-010 filed by Loredo, John Anthony on 04/28/2022. | |
April 27, 2022 | Re: Plaintiff and Plaintiff's Counsel Failure to Appear and Dismissal | ||
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Court's Order to Show Cause (CLM) heard 04/27/2022 08:30:00 AM. | |
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (LC) - scheduled for 10/31/2022 at 01:30:00 PM in 41 at Ventura. | |
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (of Colette M. Asel in Support of Dismissing Plaintiff Patricia Orness' Action Against Defendant John Anthony Loredo in its Entirety) filed by Loredo, John Anthony on 04/22/2022. | |
April 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (Iman Jaffrey's Declaration Regarding the Order to Show Cause for Failure to Appear on March 28, 2022) filed by Orness, Patricia on 04/15/2022. | |
April 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (Regarding the Order to Show Cause for Failure to Appear on March 28, 2022) filed by Orness, Patricia on 04/14/2022. | |
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice - Other (of Order to Show Cause) filed by Loredo, John Anthony on 03/29/2022. | |
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Court's Order to Show Cause (CLM) - Re: Plaintiff and Plaintiff's Counsel Failure to Appear and Dismissal scheduled for 04/27/2022 at 08:30:00 AM in 41 at Ventura. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.