Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Wiekamp, Norman Arthur filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 03, 2019 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 08, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
A final account is waived by the heirs. Petitioner waives his statutory compensation. Notice was sent to the Franchise Tax Board on 8/7/20. The Court will grant the petition for final distribution. Th...
Judge: Roger Lund |
|
August 06, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
A final account is waived by the heirs. Petitioner waives his statutory compensation. Was notice sent to the Franchise Tax Board? (Prob. C. § 9202(c).) What has happened to the decedent's family dog, ...
Judge: Roger Lund |
|
August 06, 2020 | Report of Executor and Petition for Distribution | ||
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event | received for 202 - Subsequent papers - petitions, objections or other papers in opposition on 06/23/2020. Filed By: Wiekamp, Roger W.(Executor) Refers To: Wiekamp, Norman(Decedent) | |
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Petition Other (PR) - Report of Executor and Petition for Distribution scheduled for 08/06/2020 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard. | |
June 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Petition on Waiver of Accounting (Report of Executor and Petition for Distribution) filed by Wiekamp, Roger W. on 06/19/2020. Filed By: Wiekamp, Roger W.(Executor) Refers To: Wiekamp, Norman(Decedent) | |
June 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice - Other (Waiver of Accounting By Executor and Notice of Hearing on Petition for Distribution and Consent By Roger W. Wiekamp & Betty Bethers etc.) filed by Wiekamp, Roger W. on 06/19/2020. | |
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Inventory and Appraisal (Final With Attachment 1 & 2) filed by Wiekamp, Roger W. on 12/19/2019. | |
August 28, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
Prior procedural defects have been cured. The Court intends to grant the petition and appoint Petitioner Roger W. Wiekamp as the executor of the estate, with full IAEA powers. Admit to probate the wil...
Judge: Roger Lund |
|
August 28, 2019 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.