Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Vanconas, Kendall A., Peterson, Linda, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 25, 2019 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
1) Final Account and Report of Temporary Conservatorship; 2) First and Final Account and Report of Conservatorship; 3) Termination of Conservatorship; 4) Conservator's Fees & Reimbursement of Expenses...
Judge: Roger Lund |
|
October 20, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
Hearing: 1) Final Account and Report of Temporary Conservatorship; 2) First and Final Account and Report of Conservatorship; 3) Termination of Conservatorship; 4) Conservator's Fees & Reimbursement of...
Judge: Roger Lund |
|
October 20, 2020 | Account & Report for the period of 03/26/19 through 07/18/20 due 09/04/20 | ||
October 20, 2020 | Due 07/20/20 | ||
August 18, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
The care plan was timely filed by Conservator on 9/6/19. The court has reviewed the plan, and it is complete. No appearance is required. The next previously scheduled hearing is on 8/18/20 to review t...
Judge: Roger Lund |
|
August 18, 2020 | Due 07/20/20 | ||
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous (Abstract of Judgment issued in the amount of $16,577.50 for Arnold LaRochelle Mathews VanConas & Zirbel, LLP and against Barbara Peterson And The Barbara L. Peterson Trust Dated December 22, 2008) filed by VanConas, Kendall A. on 01/30/2020. | |
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling filed by VanConas, Kendall A. on 01/30/2020. | |
January 21, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
Approve attorney fees of $16,577.50 to attorney Van Conas. As to the request to render the order for compensation a judgment against the conservatorship estate and the assets of the Barbara L. Peterso...
Judge: Roger Lund |
|
January 21, 2020 | for Order Instructing Conservator to Pay Fees to Former Attorney for the Conservator |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.