Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cavalry Spv I Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Lutz, Caroline M, against Hartmann, Dorothy R, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Kevin G. DeNoce presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin G. DeNoce Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateFebruary 11, 2019 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions154 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time154 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Stipulated judgment. | |
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment - Stipulated filed by CAVALRY SPV I LLC on 07/15/2019. | |
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment for CAVALRY SPV I LLC against Hartmann, Dorothy R in the amount of: 4261.50 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 450.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 07/15/2019. | |
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order (for entry of judgment and order thereon) filed by CAVALRY SPV I LLC on 07/15/2019. | |
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does (1-100) filed by CAVALRY SPV I LLC on 05/31/2019. | |
March 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (served Cambria Torres, occupant) filed by CAVALRY SPV I LLC on 03/28/2019. | |
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 43.
Judge: Kevin G. DeNoce |
|
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by CAVALRY SPV I LLC on 02/11/2019. | |
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by CAVALRY SPV I LLC on 02/11/2019. Filed By: CAVALRY SPV I LLC(Plaintiff) Refers To: Hartmann, Dorothy(Defendant) | |
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration/Affidavit of Venue CCP 395/396 filed by CAVALRY SPV I LLC on 02/11/2019. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.