Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Division Of Labor Standards Enforcement, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case against Contreras, Jerome Saul, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Jeffrey G. Bennett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJeffrey G. Bennett Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 11, 2019 |
CategoryEnforcement |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Case Cycle Time169 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment (Fully Satisfied) filed by DIVISION OF LABOR STANDARDS ENFORCEMENT on 07/30/2019. | |
March 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by DIVISION OF LABOR STANDARDS ENFORCEMENT on 03/08/2019. | |
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 21.
Judge: Jeffrey G. Bennett |
|
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment for DIVISION OF LABOR STANDARDS ENFORCEMENT against Contreras, Jerome Saul in the amount of: 23614.82 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 0.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 02/11/2019. | |
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Labor Board Judgment - Request for and Entry of filed by DIVISION OF LABOR STANDARDS ENFORCEMENT on 02/11/2019. Filed By: DIVISION OF LABOR STANDARDS ENFORCEMENT(Plaintiff) Refers To: Contreras, Jerome(Defendant) | |
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Labor Board judgment. | |
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by DIVISION OF LABOR STANDARDS ENFORCEMENT on 02/11/2019. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.