Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ford Motor Credit Company Llc, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case represented by Macdowell, Todd A., against Mosshart, Joshua Daniel, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Anthony J. Sabo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnthony J. Sabo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 13, 2019 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions113 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time240 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 15, 2019 | /Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Default Judgment | ||
October 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference - /Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Default Judgment scheduled for 10/15/2019 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated. | |
August 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Abstract issued on 08/14/2019. | |
July 15, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
The OSC for sanctions/dismissal for failure to file proof of service/default, set on 7/15/19, at 8:15 am in Dept. 22B. Proof of service was filed on 4/19/19, and default was entered on 6/6/19. The CMC...
Judge: Genalin Riley |
|
July 15, 2019 | |||
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment for FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC against Mosshart, Joshua Daniel in the amount of: 28424.31 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 524.00 costs, 1748.79 pre-judgment interest, and 2971.22 attorney fees entered on 07/15/2019. | |
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference - /Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Default Judgment scheduled for 10/15/2019 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura | |
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Order - Other (accepting image reproductions or copies as originals) filed by FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC on 07/15/2019. | |
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default heard 07/15/2019 08:15:00 AM. | |
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by court. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.