Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Espinoza, Yvonne, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case represented by Zaehringer, Martin, against Gallentine, Phyllis, represented by Woodward, Lyn A., in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Kevin G. DeNoce presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin G. DeNoce Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateFebruary 13, 2019 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Time To Trial278 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
||
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
||
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2021 | Re: TRIAL CALL TE 7 DAYS | ||
October 04, 2021 |
JT 5 DAY TE
Judge: Kevin G. DeNoce |
||
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference - JT 5 DAY TE scheduled for 10/04/2021 at 10:00:00 AM in 22 was vacated.
Judge: Kevin G. DeNoce |
|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial (LC) - Re: TRIAL CALL TE 7 DAYS scheduled for 11/08/2021 at 01:30:00 PM in 21 was vacated.
Judge: Kevin G. DeNoce |
|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Unconditional Settlement filed by Espinoza, Yvonne on 10/01/2021. | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous (Joint Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement) filed by Espinoza, Yvonne on 09/30/2021. | |
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Remote Mandatory Settlement Conference Procedures; Acknowledgement of Receipt and Stipulation filed by Espinoza, Yvonne on 09/29/2021. | |
November 23, 2020 |
RE: FURTHER TSC JT TE (7 Day)
Judge: Jeffrey G. Bennett |
||
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial (LC) - Re: TRIAL CALL TE 7 DAYS scheduled for 11/08/2021 at 01:30:00 PM in 21 at Ventura.
Judge: Jeffrey G. Bennett |
|
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference - JT 5 DAY TE scheduled for 10/04/2021 at 10:00:00 AM in 22 at Ventura.
Judge: Jeffrey G. Bennett |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.