Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Asperas, Joshua Lantin, Gankas, Justine Asperas, Lantin Ware, Jerica Mae, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case represented by Cohen, Bob M., against Alberta Development Partners Llc, Simi Valley Alberta Management Llc, Simi Valley Town Center, Walton Simi Investors Vi Llc, Walton Simi Town &Amp; Country Investors Vi Llc, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Jeffrey G. Bennett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJeffrey G. Bennett Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateFebruary 13, 2019 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Time To Trial230 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
||
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
||
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2021 | RE: JT TE (10 day) | ||
March 08, 2021 | |||
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference - scheduled for 03/08/2021 at 01:30:00 PM in 22 was vacated. | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Trial Setting Conference - RE: JT TE (10 day) scheduled for 03/22/2021 at 01:30:00 PM in 21 was vacated. | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by WA SVT Holdings VI LLC on 03/05/2021. | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal. | |
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party (as to WA SVT Holdings VI LLC and Simi Valley Alberta Management LLC) filed by Asperas, Joshua Lantin; Gankas, Justine Asperas; Lantin Ware, Jerica Mae on 03/04/2021. | |
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Dismissed. | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service (Complaint as to Defendants Cyril Benedict Monis and General Motors, LLC only) filed by General Motors LLC; Monis, Cyril Benedict on 02/16/2021. | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service (Complaint as to the 6th Cause of Action Servival Action-Code of Civil Procedure 377.30) filed by General Motors LLC; Monis, Cyril Benedict on 02/16/2021. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.