Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Oxnard School District, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case against Cruz, Edwardo, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Judith D. Rhodes presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudith D. Rhodes Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 13, 2019 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time22 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Restraining Order After Hearing (CLETS) served on Defendant. Copy forwarded to Sheriff for entry in CLETS (by mail) filed by Oxnard School District on 03/07/2019. | |
March 06, 2019 |
Judge: Judith D. Rhodes |
||
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Granted. | |
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Workplace Violence Restraining Order After Hearing (CLETS-WVO) (Restraining Order to Expire 03/06/22) filed by Oxnard School District on 03/06/2019. | |
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Confidential CLETS Information CLETS 001 received and scanned into CCPOR for transmittal to Law Enforcement. | |
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Restraining order as requested is granted, order expires 03/06/22 at 3 p.m.. | |
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Petition for Workplace Violence Restraining Orders (With Violence) has been Granted. | |
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) filed by Oxnard School District on 02/15/2019. | |
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - PERSONAL (attachments, Declarations, notice of hrg, Petition, TRO, blank forms) filed by Oxnard School District on 02/15/2019. | |
February 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 34.
Judge: Judith D. Rhodes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.