Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Velazquez, Monica, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Romano, Mark P., against Fca Us Llc, represented by Shepardson, Scott S., in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Anthony J. Sabo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnthony J. Sabo Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateFebruary 11, 2019 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions380 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time380 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2020 | |||
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Velazquez, Monica on 02/26/2020. | |
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement - scheduled for 04/06/2020 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated. | |
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
February 24, 2020 | |||
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement heard 02/24/2020 08:15:00 AM. | |
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement - scheduled for 04/06/2020 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura. | |
December 23, 2019 | |||
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement heard 12/23/2019 08:15:00 AM. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.