Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Writ Of Mandate case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Henry J. Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2018 |
CategoryWrit Of Mandate |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2020 |
Judge: Henry J. Walsh |
||
March 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Ruling on Submitted Matter filed by The Superior Court of Ventura on 03/24/2020. | |
March 10, 2020 |
Judge: Henry J. Walsh |
||
March 10, 2020 | Docket Event | The Court takes this matter under submission as of 03/10/2020. | |
March 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Ruling on Submitted Matter heard 03/10/2020 09:32:00 AM. | |
December 17, 2019 |
To establish briefing schedule
Judge: Henry J. Walsh |
||
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event | The Court takes this matter under submission as of 12/17/2019. | |
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Miscellaneous Hearing (SHC) heard 12/17/2019 08:30:00 AM. | |
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Reply (to Respondents Opposition Brief of Petition for Writ of Mandate) filed by Ventura Police Officers Association on 12/02/2019. | |
November 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous (Appendix of Non California Authority in Support of Opposition to Petitioner Ventura Police Officers' Association Petition for Writ of Mandate) filed by City of Ventura on 11/14/2019. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.