Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Aleman, Cindy filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 16, 2018 |
CategoryLimited Conservatorship Of Person Only |
Last RefreshedAugust 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2021 | Due 05/25/21 | ||
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) VENTURA generated. | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Case file contents transferred to receiving court Orange pursuant to court order. Case transferred per minute order dated 04/20/2021 | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous (Notice of Transferred Action to Orange County and Declaration of Mailing) filed by The Superior Court of Ventura on 04/30/2021. | |
April 20, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
The limited conservatee have moved to Trabuco Canyon in Orange County. The Court intends to order this case transferred to Orange County. __________________ As long as COVID-19 remains a public health...
Judge: Roger Lund |
|
April 20, 2021 | re Transfer to Orange County | ||
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report - Due 05/25/21 scheduled for 06/29/2021 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 was vacated. | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report scheduled on 06/29/21 is vacated. | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | The Court orders this matter be transferred to the Superior Court of California for the County of Orange upon payment of all the necessary fees required by law. The clerk of this court is authorized to transfer all the pleadings and papers herein to the clerk of the receiving court. | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling published. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.