Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Blackford, Sandra Marie filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 08, 2018 |
CategoryConservatorship Of Person And Estate |
Last RefreshedAugust 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order filed by Kernagis, Robin on 02/04/2022. | |
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Receipt of Distribution filed by Kernagis, Robin on 02/01/2022. | |
September 28, 2021 | Due 06/15/21 | ||
July 13, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Review Hearing re Confirmation of Transfer to Washington ***** The provisional order from Washington accepting the conservatorship has not been filed as of 07/06/21. Continue for provisional order fro...
Judge: Roger Lund |
|
July 13, 2021 | RE: Confirmation of transfer to Washington | ||
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Order - Other (Final Order Confirming Transfer) filed by Kernagis, Robin on 07/13/2021. | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling published. | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous (Provisional Order Granting Transfer of Guardianship or Conservatorship to the State of Washington filed June 18, 2021) filed by Kernagis, Jacki; Kernagis, Robin on 06/30/2021. | |
June 01, 2021 | RE: Confirmation of transfer to Washington | ||
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Review Hearing (PRC) - RE: Confirmation of transfer to Washington scheduled for 07/13/2021 at 10:30:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.