Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Boyle, Jeffrey L. filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2018 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
Second preliminary distribution approved in the amount of $19,000,000.00 to be distributed proportionately to the beneficiaries as shown in the petition. Preliminary distribution of the specific beque...
Judge: Roger Lund |
|
July 01, 2020 | Petition For Second Preliminary Distribution; Verification | ||
July 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Order - Other (for Secondary Preliminary Distribution) filed by Von Dollen, Steven C. on 07/01/2020. | |
June 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling published. | |
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing filed by Von Dollen, Steven C. on 06/22/2020. | |
June 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Petition Other (PR) - Petition For Second Preliminary Distribution; Verification scheduled for 07/01/2020 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard. | |
June 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Continuance VENTURA generated. | |
April 08, 2020 | Petition For Second Preliminary Distribution; Verification | ||
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Petition Other (PR) - Petition For Second Preliminary Distribution; Verification scheduled for 04/08/2020 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard. | |
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event | received for 201 - First papers other on 02/26/2020. Filed By: Von Dollen, Steven C.(Executor) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.