Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Massetti, Larissa filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 27, 2017 |
CategoryProbate |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions113 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2017 | Tentative Ruling |
This matter came before Judge pro tem Hurley on September 26, 2017. Counsel was appointed for the proposed conservatee which appointment the minute order indicates was "refused" by the proposed conser...
Judge: Glen Reiser |
|
November 17, 2017 | |||
November 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice. | |
November 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling published. | |
September 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Counsel (Mary C. Webster and the Public Defender's Office as Counsel) filed by Renger, Christi Charise on 09/27/2017. | |
September 26, 2017 | Tentative Ruling |
Tentative Ruling issued by Donald Hurley, Judge Pro Tem presiding on 9/26/17: No notice of hearing provided to proposed conservatee minor children. Capacity Declaration executed by nurse practitioner....
Judge: Glen Reiser |
|
September 26, 2017 | |||
September 26, 2017 | Docket Event | The Court appoints Ventura County Public Defender as counsel for Conservatee. | |
September 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Continued on Court's own motion. | |
September 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Petition for Appointment of Co-Conservator - scheduled for 11/17/2017 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.