Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Byrd, Maria, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Bainton, Sandy, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Derek D. Malan presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 22, 2017 |
CategoryHarassment |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions11 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
|
Case Cycle Time17 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 12, 2017 | |||
June 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Order - Other (Re: Declaration and Request for return of first appearance fee of $435.00. GRANTED.) filed by Byrd, Maria on 06/08/2017. | |
June 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Byrd, Maria on 06/02/2017. | |
June 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal. | |
June 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders - scheduled for 06/12/2017 at 08:30:00 AM in 34 was vacated. | |
June 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (Declaration of Maria Byrd) filed by Byrd, Maria on 06/02/2017. | |
June 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal. | |
May 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders - scheduled for 06/12/2017 at 08:30:00 AM in 34 at Ventura.
Judge: Derek D. Malan |
|
May 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) (DENIED) filed by Byrd, Maria on 05/23/2017. | |
May 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Hearing (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) filed by Byrd, Maria on 05/23/2017. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.