Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cope, Joshua M, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Edgar, Rupert Leon, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Derek D. Malan presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 12, 2017 |
CategoryHarassment |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions80 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
|
Case Cycle Time80 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2017 | |||
July 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order dissolved. | |
July 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of . | |
July 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders has been Dismissed. | |
July 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Unsuccessful Service (Notice of hearing, notice of new hearing, request for civil harassment restraining orders, etc.) filed by Cope, Joshua M on 07/13/2017. | |
July 10, 2017 | |||
July 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders - scheduled for 07/31/2017 at 08:30:00 AM in 34 at Ventura. | |
July 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Cope, Joshua M on 07/10/2017. | |
July 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders - rescheduled to 07/31/2017 at 08:30:00 AM in 34 at Ventura. | |
July 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Unsuccessful Service (Notice of court hearing, notice of new hearing, etc.) filed by Cope, Joshua M on 07/07/2017. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.