Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Antonio-Martinez, Juan Pablo, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Ruiz, Martin Zurita, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Derek D. Malan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 19, 2017 |
CategoryHarassment |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Case Cycle Time21 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2017 |
Judge: Derek D. Malan |
||
May 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Consent For Court Assignment (Commissioner Sabo) filed by Antonio-Martinez, Juan Pablo; Ruiz, Martin Zurita on 05/10/2017. | |
May 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Civil Harassment Restraining Order After Hearing (CLETS-CHO) (Expires 5/10/20) filed by Antonio-Martinez, Juan Pablo on 05/10/2017. | |
May 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Confidential CLETS Information CLETS 001 received and scanned into CCPOR for transmittal to Law Enforcement. | |
May 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Granted. | |
May 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders has been Granted. | |
May 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Restraining order as requested is granted, order expires 05/10/20. | |
May 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) submitted by Antonio-Martinez, Juan Pablo rejected on 05/02/2017. | |
May 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) filed by Antonio-Martinez, Juan Pablo on 05/01/2017. | |
April 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders - scheduled for 05/10/2017 at 08:30:00 AM in 34 at Ventura.
Judge: Derek D. Malan |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.