Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Bundy, Caleb Steven filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 20, 2017 |
CategoryConservatorship Of Person Only |
Last RefreshedAugust 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 28, 2024 | Due 4/18/24 | ||
May 24, 2022 | Due 04/18/22 | ||
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report Due 4/18/24 is scheduled for 05/28/2024 at 10:30AM in Department J6. | |
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report - Due 4/18/24 scheduled for 05/28/2024 at 10:30:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard. | |
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling published. | |
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Confidential Investigator report finalized. | |
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Confidential Status Report filed by Bundy, Steven Wayne; Bundy, Melissa Ann on 04/11/2022. | |
August 11, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
Limited Co-Conservators' biennial status report was filed on 07/06/20. The Court has reviewed the status report and it is incomplete. The Court advises that the form VN233 was revised July 2019 and it...
Judge: Roger Lund |
|
August 11, 2020 | RE: Failure to file VN233 Status Report form | ||
August 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous (Confidential Amended Status Report) filed by Bundy, Steven Wayne on 08/11/2020. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.