Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cavalry Spv I Llc As Assignee Of Citibank Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Burrows, Jason M., against Pfaffenberger, Jeffrey M, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Henry J. Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 29, 2016 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions232 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1257 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned (Unsatisfied) filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank NA on 06/08/2020. | |
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest (Costs $40.00; Credit to Accrued Interest $0.00; Credit to Principal $0.00; Accrued Interest $1969.14) filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank NA on 02/19/2020. | |
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Writ issued on 02/19/2020. | |
June 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned (Expired) filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank NA on 06/07/2019. | |
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned submitted by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank NA rejected on 06/05/2019. | |
May 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned submitted by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank NA rejected on 05/29/2019. | |
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ issued on 11/28/2018. | |
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest (Costs $0.00, Credits Interest $0.00, Credits Principal $0.00, Accrued Interest $976.80) filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank NA on 11/28/2018. | |
November 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Writ issued on 11/21/2017. | |
November 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest (Cost $0.00, Credit $0.00, Interest $168.00) filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank NA on 11/21/2017. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.