Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Edelstein, Julie Newsome, Edelstein Md, Michael, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case represented by Weiss, Jerrie S., against Bhat Md, Ambarish, Buxton, Michael, Dev Md, Vishva, Dudley Md, Paul, Dudley, M.D., Paul L, (total of 10) See All represented by Brandmeyer, Kent T, Clausen, Brian H, Lynch, Gregory G, Schaeffer, James C., Thelen, Dennis R, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Time To Trial152 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions152 days |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
||
Case Cycle Time234 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2018 | 15 day jury trial | ||
April 18, 2018 | |||
August 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
August 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Edelstein MD, Michael on 08/21/2017. | |
August 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service (with attached copy of Request for Dismissal filed on 07/21/2017) filed by Dev MD, Vishva; Dudley, M.D., Paul L on 08/11/2017. | |
August 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service (with attached copy of Request for Dismissal filed on 07/17/2017) filed by Dev MD, Vishva; Dudley, M.D., Paul L on 08/11/2017. | |
July 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference - scheduled for 04/18/2018 at 09:00:00 AM in 22 was vacated.
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
|
July 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial (LC) - 15 day jury trial scheduled for 05/21/2018 at 01:30:00 PM in 20 was vacated.
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
|
July 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party (as to Paul L Dudley MD, only) filed by Edelstein MD, Michael on 07/21/2017. | |
July 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by Bhat MD, Ambarish on 07/19/2017. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.