Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Jefferson Capital Systems Llc, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case represented by Brodbeck, Lori, against Hernandez, Jennifer, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions164 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time339 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2017 |
/OSC re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Default Judgment
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
||
December 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal. | |
December 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice. | |
December 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference heard 12/04/2017 08:15:00 AM. | |
December 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal. | |
October 04, 2017 |
/OSC re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Default Judgment
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
||
October 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference - /OSC re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Default Judgment scheduled for 12/04/2017 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
|
October 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference heard 10/04/2017 08:15:00 AM. | |
July 05, 2017 | Tentative Ruling |
The OSC re sanctions/dismissal for failure to file proof of service/default, set on 7/5/17, is vacated. Proof of service was filed on 2/22/17, and default was entered on 6/12/17. The CMC is continued ...
Judge: Genalin Riley |
|
July 05, 2017 |
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.