Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ashford, Mary Kathleen filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2016 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Case Cycle Time375 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order (Mary Kathleen Ashford & Cynthia Lee Hays Discharged as Personal Representatives) filed by Ashford, Mary Kathleen; Hays, Cynthia Lee on 01/08/2018. | |
January 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Receipt of Distribution (By Mary Kathleen Ashford and Cynthia Lee Hays) filed by Ashford, Mary Kathleen; Hays, Cynthia Lee on 01/04/2018. | |
September 28, 2017 | Tentative Ruling |
Tentative Ruling by Judge Pro Tem Kevin Staker on 9/28/17: The court intends to approve the Petition for Final Distribution. Including reimbursement to Petitioners of $2,770.23 for out of pocket costs...
Judge: Glen Reiser |
|
September 28, 2017 | First and Final Account and Report of Executors and Petition for Its Settlement, for Instructions Re... | ||
September 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Order for Final Distribution (Order of Final Distribution on Waiver of Accounting, First and Final account and Report of Executors and Petition for Its Settlement, For Instructions Regarding Secured Creditor, and For Authority to Withold Closing Cost Reserve etc.) filed by Hays, Cynthia Lee; Ashford, Mary Kathleen on 09/28/2017. | |
September 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Petition for Final Distribution heard 09/28/2017 09:00:00 AM. | |
September 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling published. | |
September 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing filed by Ashford, Mary Kathleen; Hays, Cynthia Lee on 09/01/2017. | |
August 24, 2017 | Docket Event | received for 202 - Subsequent papers - petitions, objections or other papers in opposition on 08/24/2017. Filed By: Hays, Cynthia Lee(Executor) | Ashford, Mary Kathleen(Executor) Refers To: Hampton, Catherene(Decedent) | |
August 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Petition for Final Distribution - First and Final Account and Report of Executors and Petition for Its Settlement, for Instructions Re: Secured Creditor, and for Authority to Withhold Closing Cost Reserve and for Final Distribution scheduled for 09/28/2017 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.