Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Diego Diaz An Individual For Himself And On Behalf Of All Others Similarly Situated, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Kreuzer, Louis H. Ii, Herbert, Joseph, against Electronic Document Processing Inc, Edp, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Henry J. Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 29, 2016 |
CategoryOther Employment |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions328 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Case Cycle Time610 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2018 | |||
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement - scheduled for 09/07/2018 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated. | |
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Diaz, Diego on 08/31/2018. | |
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
August 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement - scheduled for 09/07/2018 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura. | |
March 12, 2018 |
3 day estimate
Judge: Henry J. Walsh |
||
February 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial (LC) - 3 day estimate scheduled for 03/12/2018 at 01:30:00 PM in 42 was vacated.
Judge: Henry J. Walsh |
|
February 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Conditional Settlement (completion date 8-1-18) filed by Diaz, Diego on 02/08/2018. | |
November 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Order - Other (to dismiss class action and Paga Claims) filed by Diaz, Diego on 11/22/2017. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.