Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Biltmore Square Condominium Association Inc, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Baillio, B Austin, against Chavira, Eric Blue, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Jeffrey G. Bennett presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 15, 2016 |
CategoryEnforcement |
Last RefreshedAugust 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Case Cycle Time1141 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment (Partial Satisfaction) filed by Biltmore Square Condominium Association Inc on 04/29/2022. | |
April 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Writ issued on 04/15/2022. | |
April 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest (Costs $19,983.30; Credits to Interest $8,698.97; Credits to Principal $13,595.99; Accrued Interest $576.81) filed by Biltmore Square Condominium Association Inc on 04/15/2022. | |
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Firm Name (Change of Address for Plaintiff's Attorney) filed by Biltmore Square Condominium Association Inc on 04/11/2022. | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling (on Motion for Attorney Fees Costs) filed by Biltmore Square Condominium Association Inc on 04/13/2021. | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - MAILING (of Notice of Ruling) filed by Biltmore Square Condominium Association Inc on 04/13/2021. | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Granting (Motion for attorney fees and costs) filed by Biltmore Square Condominium Association Inc on 04/09/2021. | |
April 07, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Cases, including ex parte matters, will be called at 9 a.m., or earlier, if the Parties are ready. Please check in with the courtroom clerk by 8:45 a.m. If appearing by Court Call, please call in betw...
Judge: Jeffrey G. Bennett |
|
April 07, 2021 | and Costs; Memorandum of Points & Authorities | ||
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Motion for Attorney Fees (CLM) heard 04/07/2021 08:20:00 AM. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.