Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Esquibias, David A filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 07, 2016 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2022 | Third Account and Post Death Account and Report of Conservator of the Estate; Petition for Terminati... | ||
August 04, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
Hearing: Third Account and Post Death Account and Report of Conservator of the Estate; Petition for Termination of Conservatorship; and Petition for Allowance of Attorney's Fees and Compensation to Co...
Judge: Roger Lund |
|
August 04, 2020 | Third Account and Post Death Account and Report of Conservator of the Estate; Petition for Terminati... | ||
June 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing-Guardianship or Conservatorship (08/04/20) filed by Friend, Angelique on 06/29/2020. | |
June 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous (Financial Statements in Support of Third and Post Death Accounts and Reports) filed by Friend, Angelique on 06/29/2020. | |
June 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Fax Request for Continuance and Order (Granted; hearing advanced to 8/04/20)) filed by Friend, Angelique on 06/26/2020. | |
June 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Account and Report (PRC) - Third Account and Post Death Account and Report of Conservator of the Estate; Petition for Termination of Conservatorship; and Petition for Allowance of Attorneys' Fees and Compensation to Conservator scheduled for 08/04/2020 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard. | |
June 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Petition on Current Account (Third Account and Post Death Account and Report of Consevator of the Estate; Petition for Termination of Conservatorship; and Petiton for Allowance of Attorneys' Fees and Compensation to Conservator) filed by Friend, Angelique on 06/24/2020. Filed By: Friend, Angelique(Conservator) | |
June 24, 2020 | Docket Event | received for 201 - First papers other on 06/24/2020. Filed By: Friend, Angelique(Conservator) | |
May 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous (Confirmation of Bond Reduction) filed by Bond Services of California on 05/22/2020. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.