Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Gutierrez, Panfilo, Zenith Insurance Company, Lugo, Geraldo, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case represented by Richard, David A, Tucker, Robert M., Meyer, Matthew, against Hight, Tuesday Dawn, represented by Slack, Chad M., Mischel, Michael S., in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 23, 2015 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Time To Trial271 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions831 days |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
||
Case Cycle Time1070 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement - scheduled for 01/02/2019 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated. | |
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Gutierrez, Panfilo; Zenith Insurance Company on 11/20/2018. | |
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Dismissed. | |
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement - scheduled for 01/02/2019 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura. | |
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (LC) - T/E 7 days scheduled for 09/10/2018 at 01:30:00 PM in 20 was vacated. | |
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Conditional Settlement (completion date 10-22-18) filed by Gutierrez, Panfilo on 07/30/2018. | |
June 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Mandatory Settlement Conference heard 06/06/2018 09:00:00 AM. | |
June 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (LC) - T/E 7 days scheduled for 09/10/2018 at 01:30:00 PM in 20 at Ventura. | |
May 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement received from Gutierrez, Panfilo on 05/31/2018 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.