Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Benson, Dantia Lyana filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 08, 2015 |
CategoryLimited Conservatorship Of Person Only |
Last RefreshedAugust 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2023 | Due 02/03/23 | ||
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Confidential Investigator report finalized. | |
March 02, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Co-Conservators' biennial status report was timely filed 1/29/21. The Court has reviewed the status report and it is complete. No appearance is required. The next biennial status report shall be filed...
Judge: Roger Lund |
|
March 02, 2021 | Due 02/02/21 | ||
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report - Due 02/03/23 scheduled for 03/14/2023 at 10:30:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard. | |
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report Due 02/03/23 is scheduled for 03/14/2023 at 10:30AM in Department J6. | |
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling published. | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Confidential Status Report filed by Benson, Dantia Lyana; Benson, Virgil Lee on 01/29/2021. | |
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Confidential Investigator report finalized. | |
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Change of Residence Notice (Post-Move of Conservatee's residence) filed by Benson, Dantia Lyana on 08/09/2019. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.