Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Sosa, Edward C, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case represented by Hess, Oliver G., against Fleming, Charles G, represented by Elrod, Edward B, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 02, 2015 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Time To Trial151 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions259 days |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
||
Case Cycle Time259 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 21, 2016 | 5 day jury trial | ||
March 04, 2016 |
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
||
December 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference - scheduled for 03/04/2016 at 01:30:00 PM in 22 was vacated. | |
December 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (LC) - 5 day jury trial scheduled for 03/21/2016 at 01:30:00 PM in 40 was vacated. | |
December 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
December 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Unconditional Settlement filed by Sosa, Edward C on 12/17/2015. | |
December 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Sosa, Edward C on 12/17/2015. | |
December 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
October 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Ochoa, Frank J appointed as Mediator . | |
September 21, 2015 | Tentative Ruling |
The court intends to vacate the OSC re sanctions for failure to file Case Management Statement as to both parties, and impose no sanctions. The court is in receipt of and has considered the declaratio...
Judge: Genalin Riley |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.