Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Prieto Garcia, Jose Zacarias, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case represented by Marzban, Michael M, Cooper, Cody R., against Sanchez, Gary, Luna, Alejandro, Deatons &Amp; Associates Llc, Deaton, William, Camarillo, Bill, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 09, 2014 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1177 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time1200 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by Prieto Garcia, Jose Zacarias on 09/21/2017. | |
August 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
August 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
August 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (to Complaint) filed by Prieto Garcia, Jose Zacarias on 08/29/2017. | |
July 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication - on Complaint of Jose Prieto Garcia as to Doe Amendments 1 to 7 and 55 to 57 scheduled for 06/26/2017 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated.
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
|
June 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by Prieto Garcia, Jose Zacarias on 06/27/2017. | |
April 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication - on Complaint of Jose Prieto Garcia as to Doe Amendments 1 to 7 and 55 to 57 scheduled for 06/26/2017 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
|
April 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication heard 04/26/2017 08:15:00 AM. | |
March 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment - scheduled for 04/24/2017 at 08:20:00 AM in 42 was vacated.
Judge: Henry J. Walsh |
|
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice - Other (of Withdrawl of Defendant's Motion for Summaryt Judgment or, In the Alternative Motion for Summary Adjudication) filed by Unicor LLC of California on 03/20/2017. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.