Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Payne, Darnell, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case represented by Levy, Lawrence, against Lopez, Benjamin, represented by Wessler, Charles P, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Rebecca Susan Riley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRebecca Susan Riley Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Time To Trial380 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions428 days |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
||
Case Cycle Time428 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2015 |
(Time estimate 5 days)
Judge: Rebecca Susan Riley |
||
March 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial (LC) - (Time estimate 5 days) scheduled for 06/08/2015 at 01:30:00 PM in 40 was vacated.
Judge: Rebecca Susan Riley |
|
March 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
March 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Payne, Darnell on 03/03/2015. | |
March 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
January 14, 2015 | Tentative Ruling |
Case did not settle at MESC. JTD sufficiency of 19b statement/CRC 3.724 conference. JTD dates for Mediation/MSC and 5-day jury trial. 18-month track.
Judge: Miles Lang |
|
January 14, 2015 |
Judge: Rebecca Susan Riley |
||
January 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial (LC) - (Time estimate 5 days) scheduled for 06/08/2015 at 01:30:00 PM in 40 at Ventura.
Judge: Rebecca Susan Riley |
|
January 14, 2015 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default heard 01/14/2015 08:15:00 AM. | |
January 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling published. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.