Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Garcia, Salud, Coronado, Natalie, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Francis, Richard L., against Hernandez, Sully, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrederick H. Bysshe, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 24, 2013 |
CategoryPi/Pd/Wd - Auto |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions90 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time409 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 21 effective 02/06/2015. | |
May 28, 2014 |
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
||
March 24, 2014 | Docket Event | MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 05/28/2014 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated. | |
March 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Coronado, Natalie; Garcia, Salud on 03/24/2014. | |
March 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
March 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
January 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Coronado, Natalie; Garcia, Salud on 01/13/2014. | |
December 26, 2013 | Docket Event | MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 05/28/2014 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura. | |
December 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Coronado, Natalie; Garcia, Salud on 12/24/2013. | |
December 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by Coronado, Natalie; Garcia, Salud on 12/24/2013. Filed By: Coronado, Natalie(Plaintiff) | Garcia, Salud(Plaintiff) Refers To: Hernandez, Sully(Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.