Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
State Farm General Insurance Company, filed a(n) Product Liability case represented by Pillemer, David B, against Ford Motor Company, represented by Huang, Samson C, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 16, 2013 |
CategoryProduct Liability |
Time To Trial151 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions290 days |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
||
Case Cycle Time305 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2014 | (time estimate 3 days) | ||
November 20, 2014 |
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
||
October 29, 2014 |
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
||
October 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement - scheduled for 10/29/2014 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated.
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
|
October 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
October 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
October 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by State Farm General Insurance Company on 10/02/2014. | |
September 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement - scheduled for 10/29/2014 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
|
August 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference - scheduled for 11/20/2014 at 01:30:00 PM in 22 was vacated.
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
|
August 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial (LC) - (time estimate 3 days) scheduled for 12/01/2014 at 01:30:00 PM in 41 was vacated.
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.